Global Patent Index - EP 1067500 A2

EP 1067500 A2 2001-01-10 - Label and its use

Title (en)

Label and its use

Title (de)

Etikett und Verwendung des Etiketts

Title (fr)

Etiquette et son usage

Publication

EP 1067500 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112980 A

Priority

DE 19930833 A

Abstract (en)

The label, to identify packages, has a carrier (1) with an adhesive (3) on the rear side. The front side has a surface for the description (5). A part-label (7), which can be peeled from the main label, has an adhesive on the rear side and a surface for description (8) on the front side. The part-label (7) has the same dimensions as the main label, and the description on the main label is only visible when the part-label is removed.

Abstract (de)

Ein zweiteiliges Etikett wird vorgeschlagen, dessen beide Teile gleiche Informationen enthalten. Das Etikett wird zusammenhängend auf eine Verpackungeinheit aufgeklebt. Sobald die Verpackungeinheit in ein Regalsystem eingesetzt ist, wird ein Teil des Etiketts abgelöst und auf das Regal geklebt. Dadurch kann eine Zuordnung zwischen dem Inhalt der Verpackungseinheit und dem Platz in dem Regal definiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/10; G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19930833 A1 20010104; AT 7713 U1 20050725; EP 1067500 A2 20010110; EP 1067500 A3 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030417

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI