Global Patent Index - EP 1067510 A2

EP 1067510 A2 2001-01-10 - Hi-hat

Title (en)

Hi-hat

Title (de)

Hi-Hat

Title (fr)

Cymbale double à coulisse

Publication

EP 1067510 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114509 A

Priority

DE 19931363 A

Abstract (en)

One cymbal (2) clashes against the other cymbal (4) and is joined by an up and down moving bar (7) on or in a stand (3). The second cymbal also moves up and down; is clashed against the first cymbal and is guided by a set of rods (9). The up and down moving bar is positioned with the top cymbal inside a tubular stand (6) which, with the bar, is enclosed by a tubular sleeve (10). The movable bar is connected by a foot pedal (12) acting upon a cable-pull (13) with deflector roller (14),

Abstract (de)

Ein Hi-Hat 1 verfügt über eine Bedieneinrichtung 1, mit deren Hilfe sowohl der obere Beckenteller 2 wie der untere Beckenteller 4 bewegt werden kann. Der obere Beckenteller 2 ist hierzu einer Stange 7 zugeordnet, die über das Fußpedal 12 wie bekannt nach unten gegen den unteren Beckenteller 4 bewegt werden kann. Gleichzeitig wird diese Bewegung des Fußpedals 12 über einen Seilzug 13 und eine Umlenkrolle 14 so umgelenkt, dass über entsprechende Verbindungen ein Hüllrohr 10, das den unteren Beckenteller 4 trägt, in die umgekehrte Richtung, d. h. also hier nach oben bewegt wird. Über zylindrische Federn 24, 25 und weitere Sicherungen wird erreicht, dass Überbeanspruchungen der Teile nicht auftreten können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067510 A2 20010110; EP 1067510 A3 20010418; DE 19931363 A1 20010111; US 6316708 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010519

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI