Global Patent Index - EP 1067510 A3

EP 1067510 A3 2001-04-18 - Hi-hat

Title (en)

Hi-hat

Title (de)

Hi-Hat

Title (fr)

Cymbale double à coulisse

Publication

EP 1067510 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00114509 A

Priority

DE 19931363 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067510A2] One cymbal (2) clashes against the other cymbal (4) and is joined by an up and down moving bar (7) on or in a stand (3). The second cymbal also moves up and down; is clashed against the first cymbal and is guided by a set of rods (9). The up and down moving bar is positioned with the top cymbal inside a tubular stand (6) which, with the bar, is enclosed by a tubular sleeve (10). The movable bar is connected by a foot pedal (12) acting upon a cable-pull (13) with deflector roller (14),

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067510 A2 20010110; EP 1067510 A3 20010418; DE 19931363 A1 20010111; US 6316708 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010519

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI