Global Patent Index - EP 1067535 A9

EP 1067535 A9 2001-05-16 - Information recording medium

Title (en)

Information recording medium

Title (de)

Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium

Title (fr)

Support d'enregistrement optique

Publication

EP 1067535 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00305480 A

Priority

JP 18914999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067535A2] At the least, a first recording layer 2 and a translucent film layer 3 are laminated in order on a transparent substrate 1 to form a first information recording/reproduction unit; and at the least, a reflective film layer 6 and a second recording layer 5 are laminated in order on a transparent substrate 7 to form a second information recording/reproduction unit. Then, the first and the second information recording/reproduction units are glued together by a transparent bonding layer 4, with the translucent film layer 3 facing the second recording layer 5, so that a two-layer information recording medium is obtained. Further, grooves G and lands L are formed for the first and the second recording layers 2 and 5. The depths of the grooves are substantially equal for the first and the second recording layers 2 and 5, the heights of the lands L are substantially equal for the first and the second recording layers 2 and 5, and the depth of the grooves G are greater than the height of the lands L. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/24; G11B 7/007

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/007 (2006.01); G11B 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/00718 (2013.01); G11B 7/007 (2013.01); G11B 7/24 (2013.01); G11B 7/24038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067535 A2 20010110; EP 1067535 A3 20020109; EP 1067535 A9 20010516; JP 2001023237 A 20010126; US 2005063295 A1 20050324

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100101

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI