Global Patent Index - EP 1067564 A1

EP 1067564 A1 2001-01-10 - Resistor device with fuse function

Title (en)

Resistor device with fuse function

Title (de)

Widerstandsanordnung mit Schmelzsicherung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de résistance comprenant un fusible

Publication

EP 1067564 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00114282 A

Priority

IT UD990129 A

Abstract (en)

Resistor device with fuse function comprising at least a resistive element (14) able to have current pass through, said resistive element (14) being enclosed between at least two containing insulating elements (18, 17), in at least one segment of at least one of said containing elements (17, 18) there being a localised zone of discontinuity characterised by a coefficient of heat exchange less than the coefficient of heat exchange of the remaining part of said at least one containing element (17, 18), said localised zone of discontinuity being able to create along said resistive element (14) a defined preferential melting point when the circulating current exceeds a pre-determined threshold value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 3/12; H01C 1/028; H01H 85/48; B60H 1/00; H01H 85/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/028 (2006.01); H01C 3/12 (2006.01); H01H 85/048 (2006.01); H01H 85/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 3/12 (2013.01); H01C 1/028 (2013.01); H01H 85/048 (2013.01); H01H 85/0056 (2013.01); H01H 85/0069 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067564 A1 20010110; IT 1310875 B1 20020222; IT UD990129 A1 20010109; IT UD990129 D0 19990709

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERTOSSI, BRUNO

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI