Global patent index - EP 1067572 A2

EP 1067572 A2 2001-01-10 - Cathode ray tube with indirectly heated cathode

Title (en)

Cathode ray tube with indirectly heated cathode

Title (de)

Kathodenstrahlröhre mit indirekt geheizter Kathode

Title (fr)

Tuba à rayons cathodiques avec cathode à chauffage indirect

Publication

EP 1067572 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114001 A

Priority

JP 19015499 A

Abstract (en)

A cathode ray tube has a vacuum envelope formed of a panel portion (11), a neck portion (12) and a funnel portion (13) for connecting the panel portion and the neck portion, a phosphor screen (14) formed on an inner surface of the panel portion, and an electron gun (19) housed in the neck portion and including a cathode (40) and a heater (31a). The cathode includes a disk-shaped cathode base metal (41) having an oxide coating (42) thereon and a cylindrical cathode sleeve (43) housing the heater. The cylindrical cathode sleeve includes a small-diameter portion (43c) having the disk-shaped cathode base metal fitted within an end thereof and housing a top portion of the heater and a large-diameter portion housing leg portions (31) of the heater, and an axial length SL (mm) of the small-diameter portion and an outside diameter DD (mm) of the disk-shaped cathode base metal satisfies the following inequation: <DF>0.5 SL/DD 4.0. </DF> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/18 (2006.01); H01J 1/26 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/26 (2013.01); H01J 29/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067572 A2 20010110; EP 1067572 A3 20020821; CN 1279500 A 20010110; JP 2001023504 A 20010126; KR 20010015149 A 20010226; TW 452818 B 20010901

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080118

2007-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070907

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01J 1/20 A, 7H 01J 29/04 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI