Global patent index - EP 1067573 A2

EP 1067573 A2 2001-01-10 - Method for producing a cathode-ray tube

Title (en)

Method for producing a cathode-ray tube

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren einer Kathodenstrahlröhre

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un tube à rayons cathodiques

Publication

EP 1067573 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114519 A

Priority

JP 19563699 A

Abstract (en)

In order to form a screen layer having less color fogging and coating unevenness in the course of production of a cathode-ray tube, a panel inner surface having a carbon layer (6) formed thereon is precoated with a solution of a nonionic surfactant (e.g., polyoxyethylene sorbitan fatty acid ester), and a phosphor layer (3) is formed on the panel inner surface (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/227; H01J 29/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/22 (2006.01); H01J 9/227 (2006.01); H01J 29/18 (2006.01); H01J 29/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/327 (2013.01); H01J 9/2271 (2013.01); H01J 9/2278 (2013.01); H01J 29/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067573 A2 20010110; EP 1067573 A3 20011219; CN 1156869 C 20040707; CN 1280377 A 20010117; JP 2001023519 A 20010126; JP 3680646 B2 20050810; KR 100376644 B1 20030319; KR 20010015225 A 20010226; TW 457508 B 20011001

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050607

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI