Global Patent Index - EP 1067573 A3

EP 1067573 A3 2001-12-19 - Method for producing a cathode-ray tube

Title (en)

Method for producing a cathode-ray tube

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren einer Kathodenstrahlröhre

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un tube à rayons cathodiques

Publication

EP 1067573 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00114519 A

Priority

JP 19563699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067573A2] In order to form a screen layer having less color fogging and coating unevenness in the course of production of a cathode-ray tube, a panel inner surface having a carbon layer (6) formed thereon is precoated with a solution of a nonionic surfactant (e.g., polyoxyethylene sorbitan fatty acid ester), and a phosphor layer (3) is formed on the panel inner surface (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/227; H01J 29/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/22 (2006.01); H01J 9/227 (2006.01); H01J 29/18 (2006.01); H01J 29/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/327 (2013.01); H01J 9/2271 (2013.01); H01J 9/2278 (2013.01); H01J 29/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5707682 A 19980113 - PATEL HIMANSHU M [US], et al
  • [A] US 4196015 A 19800401 - LOPEZ HUGO A [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 088 (E - 170) 12 April 1983 (1983-04-12)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 250 (E - 633) 14 July 1988 (1988-07-14)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199751, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A25, AN 1997-554778, XP002158879
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 103 (E - 244) 15 May 1984 (1984-05-15)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067573 A2 20010110; EP 1067573 A3 20011219; CN 1156869 C 20040707; CN 1280377 A 20010117; JP 2001023519 A 20010126; JP 3680646 B2 20050810; KR 100376644 B1 20030319; KR 20010015225 A 20010226; TW 457508 B 20011001

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050607

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI