Global Patent Index - EP 1067581 A3

EP 1067581 A3 2003-06-25 - Discharge lamp

Title (en)

Discharge lamp

Title (de)

Entladungslampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge

Publication

EP 1067581 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00114202 A

Priority

JP 19049599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067581A2] A discharge lamp having a pair of electrodes (2) within a light-emitting tube with air-tight seals formed covering a metallic foil (1) is bonded to each electrode (2). To stiffen the metallic foil, it is provided with a length-wise crease (M). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/36; H01J 5/32; H01J 61/073

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/06 (2006.01); H01J 9/28 (2006.01); H01J 61/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/36 (2013.01); H01J 9/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067581 A2 20010110; EP 1067581 A3 20030625; JP 2001023565 A 20010126; JP 3085303 B1 20000904; KR 20010049717 A 20010615; US 6590341 B1 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 61/36 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 61/073 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 5/32 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI