Global patent index - EP 1067616 A2

EP 1067616 A2 2001-01-10 - Waveguide twist

Title (en)

Waveguide twist

Title (de)

Hohlleitertwist

Title (fr)

Guide d'ondes à torsade

Publication

EP 1067616 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00401229 A

Priority

DE 19931404 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6404298B1] In a waveguide twist having a torsion element with at least three individual parts situated adjacent to each other and rotatable around an axis of the torsion element, in which each of the individual parts has a central passage hole with a cross-section corresponding to the open cross-section of the waveguides, and in which the passage holes of the individual parts in a non-rotated condition of the torsion element are aligned with each other, a recess is formed in one face of each of the individual parts, the extent of the recess in circumferential direction corresponding to a specified angle of rotation; from the other face of the individual parts a pin extends in an axial direction; and in a mounted position of the torsion element a pin projecting from one individual part engages in the recess located in the face of the adjacent individual part.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Hohlleitertwist zur Verbindung von elektromagnetischen Hohlleitern mit rechteckigem Querschnitt angegeben, der aus einem Torsionselement (1) mit mindestens drei lückenlos nebeneinander liegenden, um die Achse desselben drehbaren Scheiben (2) besteht. Jede Scheibe (2) hat ein zentrales Durchgangsloch (9) mit rechteckigem Querschnitt. Die Durchgangslöcher (9) der Scheiben (2) fluchten im nicht gedrehten Zustand des Torsionselements (1) miteinander. Zur einfachen Einstellung eines gewünschten Drehwinkels ist in jeweils einer Stirnseite der Scheiben (2) ein sich in Umfangsrichtung erstreckendes Langloch angebracht, dessen Länge einem vorgegebenen Drehwinkel entspricht. Von der anderen Stirnseite der Scheiben (2) stehen in axialer Richtung verlaufende Stifte ab. In Montageposition des Torsionselements (1) greift ein von einer Scheibe (2) abstehender Stift in das an der Stirnseite der benachbarten Scheibe befindliche Langloch ein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/06; H01P 1/02; H01P 1/161

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/02 (2006.01); H01P 1/06 (2006.01); H01P 1/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/165 (2013.01); H01P 1/025 (2013.01); H01P 1/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067616 A2 20010110; EP 1067616 A3 20050323; AU 4086000 A 20010111; BR 0002542 A 20010313; CN 1280401 A 20010117; DE 19931404 A1 20010111; US 6404298 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2008-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL LUCENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-12-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040806

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI