Global Patent Index - EP 1067627 A1

EP 1067627 A1 2001-01-10 - Dual band radio apparatus

Title (en)

Dual band radio apparatus

Title (de)

Zweibandfunkgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de radiocommunication à deux bandes

Publication

EP 1067627 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113329 A

Priority

EP 99113329 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a radio apparatus (1), particularly for mobile use, comprising an antenna arrangement (5) with at least the first antenna element (20) and a second antenna element, wherein said first antenna element (20) and said second antenna element are coupled so that said antenna arrangement (5) is operational in at least to difference frequency bands and wherein the two antenna elements are connected to a ground plate (10) by first and second connecting means (50 and 60). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 5/00; H01Q 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/005 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 5/378 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067627 A1 20010110; EP 1067627 B1 20090624; DE 69941025 D1 20090806; DK 1067627 T3 20090928

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100325

2009-09-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-09-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-08-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69941025 P 20090806

2009-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE

2009-06-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IPCOM GMBH & CO. KG

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021216

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FI FR GB SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI