Global Patent Index - EP 1067757 A1

EP 1067757 A1 2001-01-10 - Curled surface imaging system

Title (en)

Curled surface imaging system

Title (de)

Bilderzeugungssystem für gekrümmte Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Système d'imagerie pour des surfaces bouclées

Publication

EP 1067757 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305483 A

Priority

EP 99305483 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a system for de-warping images of an applicable surface, including applicable curled surfaces, and in particular of images of curled documents (30). The system (1) includes a processor (25) linked to an image capture means (2) which: captures an image of the surface (30), said image having a warp corresponding to the non-planar surface; generates from the image a first set of data points representing the three-dimensional profile of the non-planar surface relative (30) to a planar reference surface (12); fits to the first set of data points a second set of data points representative of an applicable mesh; and uses the second set of data points to texture-map the image (12) in order to de-warp the image. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 17/40 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 3/00 (2006.01); G06T 7/60 (2006.01); G06T 15/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/047 (2006.01); H04N 1/195 (2006.01); H04N 1/387 (2006.01); H04N 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/387 (2013.01); H04N 1/195 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0434 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0452 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067757 A1 20010110; DE 60037865 D1 20080313; DE 60037865 T2 20081204; EP 1110373 A1 20010627; EP 1110373 B1 20080123; JP 2003504772 A 20030204; JP 4623898 B2 20110202; US 6885479 B1 20050426; WO 0105140 A1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI