Global Patent Index - EP 1067821 A2

EP 1067821 A2 2001-01-10 - Hearing-aid

Title (en)

Hearing-aid

Title (de)

Hörhilfe

Title (fr)

Prothèse auditive

Publication

EP 1067821 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810584 A

Priority

CH 125699 A

Abstract (en)

The device, esp. an electronic circuit, suppresses noise signals in an input signal (7) with an arrangement (4) for frequency-dependent attenuation of signal components. in a main signal path (5) whose output forms the output of the device. A signal analysis path (6) parallel to the main signal path has an arrangement for periodically computing frequency-dependent attenuation factors from the input signal and is connected to the main signal path so that the attenuation factors are available to the attenuation arrangement. An Independent claim is also included for a method of suppressing noise signals in an input signal.

Abstract (de)

Die Unterdrückung von Störlärm in einem Eingangssignal (7) erfolgt in einem Hauptsignalpfad (5), der weder eine Transformation in den Frequenzbereich noch eine Aufteilung in Teilbandsignale, sondern lediglich ein Unterdrückungsfilter (4) aufweist. Die Übertragungsfunktion des Unterdrückungsfilters (4) wird periodisch neu bestimmt wird aufgrund von Abschwächungsfaktoren, die in einem parallel zum Hauptsignalpfad (5) liegenden Signalanalysepfad (6) ermittelt werden. Die Abschwächungsfaktoren werden zur Abschwächung von Signalkomponenten in Frequenzbändern mit erheblichem Anteil an Störlärm verwendet. Das Unterdrückungsfilter (4) ist als Transversalfilter realisiert, dessen Impulsantwort periodisch als gewichtete Summe der Impulsantworten von transversalen Bandpassfiltern neu berechnet wird. Der Signalanalysepfad (6) umfasst in einer Baumstruktur angeordnete transversale Halbbandfilter (1a-1g) mit sukzessiv reduzierter Verarbeitungsrate, die eine Aufteilung in Teilsignale in acht oder mehr Frequenzbänder mit hoher Trennschärfe ermöglichen. Auf diese Weise wird eine Verarbeitung mit geringer Signalverzögerung und einer Untersuchung des Anteils an Störlärm in genügend vielen Frequenzbändern mit genügend hoher Trennschärfe überhaupt erst möglich.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/502 (2013.01); H04R 2225/43 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067821 A2 20010110; EP 1067821 A3 20080430; AU 4508300 A 20010111; AU 771005 B2 20040311; US 6580798 B1 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2008-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081021

2008-04-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-04-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI