Global Patent Index - EP 1067822 A1

EP 1067822 A1 2001-01-10 - Heating element manufacturing process for heating or cooking apparatus,such heating element and apparatus incorporating it

Title (en)

Heating element manufacturing process for heating or cooking apparatus,such heating element and apparatus incorporating it

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren eines Heizelements für Heizungs- oder Kochvorrichtung,solches Heizelement so hergestellt und so ausgerüstete Einrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'élément chauffant pour appareil de chauffage ou cuisson, élément chauffant ainsi obtenu et appareils ainsi équipés

Publication

EP 1067822 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00450011 A

Priority

FR 9909195 A

Abstract (en)

The element is fabricated by moulding (M1, M2) a core (1) from an envelope of a fusible material and allowing to flow in the mould a material of a ferrous alloy which has a fusion temperature close to that of the envelope material. The envelope has a thickness and a thermal inertia sufficient to permit a superficial fusion of the envelope without causing it to deteriorate.

Abstract (fr)

L'objet de l'invention un est procédé de fabrication d'un élément chauffant pour appareil de chauffage ou cuisson, du type comprenant un moyen calorifique associé à un dissipateur thermique, caractérisé en ce qu'il consiste à placer dans un moule (M1, M2) un moyen calorifique (1) faisant office de noyau, ledit moyen ainsi que la paroi interne du moule étant conformés aux formes et dimensions de l'élément chauffant à réaliser, ledit moyen calorifique (1) comportant au moins une enveloppe en matériau fusible et à couler dans le moule un matériau fondu constitué d'un alliage notamment ferreux à température de fusion sensiblement équivalente à celle de ladite enveloppe du moyen calorifique, cette enveloppe présentant une épaisseur et une inertie thermique suffisantes pour permettre une fusion superficielle de l'enveloppe sans la détériorer. Application aux appareils de chauffage ou cuisson. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/50; H05B 3/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/50 (2006.01); H05B 3/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/688 (2013.01); H05B 3/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067822 A1 20010110; EP 1067822 B1 20051116; AT 310370 T 20051215; DE 60023995 D1 20051222; DE 60023995 T2 20060810; DK 1067822 T3 20060327; ES 2253196 T3 20060601; FR 2796199 A1 20010112; FR 2796199 B1 20011012

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170713

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170616

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150707

2016-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150707

2016-02-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-15 [REG FR LIMR] LIMITATION OF CLAIMS

- Effective date: 20120516

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253196 T3

2006-05-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060400617

2006-03-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023995 P 20051222

2005-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI