Global Patent Index - EP 1067829 A2

EP 1067829 A2 2001-01-10 - Plasma nozzle

Title (en)

Plasma nozzle

Title (de)

Plasmadüse

Title (fr)

Buse à plasma

Publication

EP 1067829 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113748 A

Priority

DE 29911974 U

Abstract (en)

The plasma nozzle is designed so that the mouth (18) of the nozzle duct is curved in relation to the vertical axis (A). The housing (10) is rotatable about its axis (A). The housing (10) is located rotationally on a carrying tube (14). The counter electrode is formed by the housing (10).

Abstract (de)

Plasmadüse, insbesondere zum Vorbehandeln von Oberflächen, mit einem rohrförmigen Gehäuse (10), das einen von einem Arbeitsgas durchströmten Düsenkanal (16) bildet, einer koaxial in dem Düsenkanal angeordneten Elektrode (24) und einer den Düsenkanal umgebenden Gegenelektrode, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Mündung (18) des Düsenkanals gegenüber dieser Achse abgewinkelt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/24 (2006.01); H05H 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/34 (2013.01); H05H 2001/3463 (2013.01); H05H 2001/3478 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911974 U1 20001123; AT 326827 T 20060615; DE 50012751 D1 20060622; DK 1067829 T3 20060918; EP 1067829 A2 20010110; EP 1067829 A3 20030625; EP 1067829 B1 20060517; ES 2265312 T3 20070216; JP 2001068298 A 20010316; JP 4111659 B2 20080702; PT 1067829 E 20061031; US 6262386 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060629

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060818

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2007-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2265312 T3

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2006-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-09-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-09-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012751 P 20060622

2006-06-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLASMA TREAT GMBH

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI