Global Patent Index - EP 1067887 A1

EP 1067887 A1 2001-01-17 - MULTICHANNEL IMPLANTABLE INNER EAR STIMULATOR

Title (en)

MULTICHANNEL IMPLANTABLE INNER EAR STIMULATOR

Title (de)

AUS MEHREREN KANÄLEN BESTEHENDE IMPLANTIERBARE INNENOHR-STIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

STIMULATEUR IMPLANTABLE MULTI-CANAUX D'OREILLE INTERNE

Publication

EP 1067887 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916306 A

Priority

  • CA 2288314 A
  • US 9907279 W
  • US 8026898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949815A1] A device is described for stimulating the auditory transmission branch of the 8th nerve. It uses electrodes designed to restrict the electrical field to the region of their respective nerve fiber group and produce a gradient field for each channel such that the latency characteristics of the nerve fibers in a given channel will cause a sequential firing (streaming) of the nerve fibers during a portion of the channel stimulus pulse. In the analog system the nerve fiber channels are stimulated in sequence but with their stimulus overlapping their previous channel by an amount equal to the shortest latency period of said channel. During the period when a stimulus pulse is causing nerve fiber streaming the pulse amplitude is modulated with the audio information. In addition during the nerve fiber streaming either electrical means or the shape of the probe compensate for the strength-duration characteristics of the individual nerve fibers. In the digital system there is no streaming as there is a single firing time for nerve fibers in a channel. The channel overlap exists over a number of channels and the audio modulation is in the form of frequency modulation of the channel sequence frequency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/18 (2006.01); A61N 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/36036 (2017.08); A61F 2/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949815 A1 19991007; AU 3465699 A 19991018; AU 745630 B2 20020328; BR 9909336 A 20011106; CA 2288314 A1 20010502; EP 1067887 A1 20010117; EP 1067887 A4 20020605; HR P20000641 A2 20011231; IL 138794 D0 20011031; JP 2002509761 A 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-06-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61F 2/18 A, 7A 61N 1/36 B

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE