Global Patent Index - EP 1067920 A1

EP 1067920 A1 2001-01-17 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING UV-INDUCED INHIBITION OF COLLAGEN SYNTHESIS IN HUMAN SKIN

Title (en)

METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING UV-INDUCED INHIBITION OF COLLAGEN SYNTHESIS IN HUMAN SKIN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG VON UV-INDUZIERTEN KOLLAGENSYNTHESISHEMMUNG IN MENSCHLICHEN HAUT

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS DE REDUCTION DE L'INHIBITION DE LA SYNTHESE DE COLLAGENE INDUITE PAR UN RAYONNEMENT UV DANS LA PEAU HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1067920 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918456 A

Priority

  • US 9907267 W
  • US 8043798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951220A1] Exposure of human skin to ultraviolet (UV) radiation from the sun not only induces the production of enzymes (matrix metalloproteinases) that degrade collagen, but also inhibits the synthesis of new collagen by inhibiting the synthesis of procollagen. This UV-induced inhibition of the synthesis of collagen can be prevented by the topical application of a retinoid or c-JUN inhibitor to the skin prior to its exposure to UV radiation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/20; A61K 31/12; A61K 31/17; A61K 31/235; A61K 31/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61K 31/07 (2006.01); A61K 31/165 (2006.01); A61K 31/167 (2006.01); A61K 31/17 (2006.01); A61K 31/185 (2006.01); A61K 31/196 (2006.01); A61K 31/203 (2006.01); A61K 31/235 (2006.01); A61K 31/277 (2006.01); A61K 31/35 (2006.01); A61K 31/352 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 19/08 (2013.01); A61K 8/35 (2013.01); A61K 8/37 (2013.01); A61K 8/671 (2013.01); A61K 31/07 (2013.01); A61K 31/165 (2013.01); A61K 31/167 (2013.01); A61K 31/185 (2013.01); A61K 31/196 (2013.01); A61K 31/203 (2013.01); A61K 31/277 (2013.01); A61K 31/352 (2013.01); A61K 31/4439 (2013.01); A61K 31/517 (2013.01); A61K 31/522 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61K 2800/522 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951220 A1 19991014; WO 9951220 A9 20000427; AR 018826 A1 20011212; AU 3637499 A 19991025; AU 740569 B2 20011108; BR 9909899 A 20001226; CA 2326507 A1 19991014; CN 1303282 A 20010711; EP 1067920 A1 20010117; EP 1067920 A4 20030102; JP 2002510621 A 20020409; TW I234455 B 20050621

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060215

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040315

2003-01-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/20 A, 7A 61K 31/12 B, 7A 61K 31/235 B, 7A 61K 31/35 B, 7A 61K 31/17 B, 7A 61K 31/07 B, 7A 61K 31/52 B, 7A 61K 31/165 B

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001030

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE