Global Patent Index - EP 1067952 A1

EP 1067952 A1 2001-01-17 - METHODS FOR TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF INFECTIONS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF INFECTIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND VORBEUGUNG VON INFEKTIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT ET DE PREVENTION DES INFECTIONS

Publication

EP 1067952 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916478 A

Priority

  • US 9907654 W
  • US 8126298 P
  • US 8902498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952540A1] The present invention provides methods, kit, and pharmaceutical compositions for treating or preventing an infection in a mammal comprising the administration of an amount effective for treating or preventing an infection of angiotensinogen, angiotensin I (AI), AI analogues, AI fragments and analogues thereof, angiotensin II (AII), AII analogues, AII fragments or analogues thereof or AII AT2 type 2 receptor agonists.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/08; C07K 7/14; C12N 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/08 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 5/093 (2006.01); C07K 5/097 (2006.01); C07K 5/103 (2006.01); C07K 5/113 (2006.01); C07K 7/14 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/0819 (2013.01); A61K 38/085 (2013.01); C07K 5/0821 (2013.01); C07K 5/101 (2013.01); C07K 5/1021 (2013.01); C07K 7/14 (2013.01); C12N 2501/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952540A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952540 A1 19991021; AU 3479099 A 19991101; AU 752041 B2 20020905; CA 2324988 A1 19991021; EP 1067952 A1 20010117; JP 2002511416 A 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/08 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 7/14 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/00 B

2003-01-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHODS FOR TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF INFECTIONS BY ANALOGUES OF ANGIOTENSIN II

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/08 A, 7C 07K 7/14 B, 7A 61P 31/00 B

2003-01-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHODS FOR TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF INFECTIONS BY ANALOGUES OF ANGIOTENSIN II

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001009

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE