Global Patent Index - EP 1067998 A1

EP 1067998 A1 2001-01-17 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING OXIDES OF HEAVY ISOTOPES OF HYDROGEN FROM WATER

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING OXIDES OF HEAVY ISOTOPES OF HYDROGEN FROM WATER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON OXIDEN SCHWERER WASSERSTOFFISOTOPE AUS WASSER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SEPARATION D'OXYDES D'ISOTOPES LOURDS D'HYDROGENE, A PARTIR DE L'EAU

Publication

EP 1067998 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916150 A

Priority

  • US 9906294 W
  • US 4764898 A
  • US 6359398 A
  • US 9345998 A
  • US 27533599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948586A1] A process and apparatus for treating the heavy hydrogen isotope content of the contaminated water by contacting the contamined water with a molecular separation material (28) including a support medium carrying a plurality of hydration sites having associated waters of hydration, whereby a portion of the waters of hydration are replaced with heavy hydrogen isotope water molecules from the contaminated water. The hydrogen isotope water molecule content of the contaminated water is thus decreased. The molecular separation material (28) is preferably a polymer, such as a polystyrene/divinyl benzene cross-linked polymer, having hydration sites with associated waters of hydration. Preferred hydration sites are obtained by reacting the polymer which has been sulfonated or phosphonated to create reactive sites, with a salt of, for example, aluminum, sodium, magnesium, copper, zinc, cobalt, iron, nickel, manganese, potassium and chromium. Before or during contact with the molecular separation material (28), the contaminated water may be brought into contact with a separation membrane (12) selectively permeable to light water molecules relative to hydrogen isotope water molecules, to remove light water molecules from the water, thereby increasing the concentration of said hydrogen isotope molecules.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 15/04; B01D 59/00; C01B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/06 (2006.01); B01D 15/04 (2006.01); B01D 59/12 (2006.01); B01D 59/26 (2006.01); B01D 59/30 (2006.01); B01D 59/50 (2006.01); B01D 61/00 (2006.01); B01D 61/36 (2006.01); B01D 63/02 (2006.01); B01D 63/06 (2006.01); B01D 69/00 (2006.01); B01J 49/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/42 (2006.01); C02F 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/44 (2013.01); B01D 59/12 (2013.01); B01D 59/26 (2013.01); B01D 59/50 (2013.01); B01D 61/00 (2013.01); B01D 61/36 (2013.01); B01D 63/02 (2013.01); B01D 63/068 (2013.01); B01D 2313/28 (2013.01); C02F 1/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948586 A1 19990930; AU 3452599 A 19991018; CA 2325987 A1 19990930; EP 1067998 A1 20010117; EP 1067998 A4 20040804; JP 2003521362 A 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-08-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 01D 15/04 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 01D 59/00 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 01B 5/02 B

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB