Global Patent Index - EP 1068022 A1

EP 1068022 A1 2001-01-17 - ATOMISING BOWL AND ELECTROSTATIC ROTARY SPRAYHEAD UNIT EQUIPPED THEREWITH

Title (en)

ATOMISING BOWL AND ELECTROSTATIC ROTARY SPRAYHEAD UNIT EQUIPPED THEREWITH

Title (de)

SPRÜHGLOCKE UND ROTATIONSZERSTÄUBER MIT EINER SOLCHEN SPRÜHGLOCKE

Title (fr)

BOL DE PULVERISATION ET PROJECTEUR ROTATIF ELECTROSTATIQUE EQUIPE D'UN TEL BOL

Publication

EP 1068022 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99910470 A

Priority

  • FR 9900752 W
  • FR 9804269 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776946A1] The invention concerns an atomising bowl (4) for coating product electrostatic rotary sprayhead unit (1), said bowl comprising a bell (7) for distributing the product made from a conductive material and arranged to be brought to high voltage when the sprayhead unit is in operation, so as charge electrostatically said product by contact. The invention is characterised in that said bell is electrically connected to at least one corona discharge element (22, 25, 28) from one tapered end (22a, 25a, 25b, 28a), said tapered end being arranged in the proximity of said bowl outer surface (20a, 9a). The bowl is electrically connected to a generator capable of detecting variations in the glow currents passing through the discharge elements (22, 25, 28) or the bowl tips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/04 (2006.01); B05B 5/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/1042 (2013.01); B05B 3/1064 (2013.01); B05B 5/0407 (2013.01); B05B 5/0533 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949982A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776946 A1 19991008; FR 2776946 B1 20000526; AU 2941399 A 19991018; BR 9908740 A 20001121; CA 2320880 A1 19991007; CN 1120056 C 20030903; CN 1292731 A 20010425; DE 69909605 D1 20030821; DE 69909605 T2 20040415; EP 1068022 A1 20010117; EP 1068022 B1 20030716; ES 2203089 T3 20040401; HU 0102390 A2 20011028; JP 2002509795 A 20020402; PL 343080 A1 20010730; TR 200002697 T2 20001221; TW 429168 B 20010411; US 6347754 B1 20020219; WO 9949982 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69909605

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAMES TECHNOLOGIES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203089 T3

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-12-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909605 P 20030821

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAMES TECHNOLOGIES

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000811

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000811