Global Patent Index - EP 1068035 A1

EP 1068035 A1 2001-01-17 - METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS CASTING OF A THIN STRIP AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS CASTING OF A THIN STRIP AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STRANGGIESSEN EINES DÜNNEN BANDES SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COULEE CONTINUE D'UNE BANDE MINCE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1068035 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915539 A

Priority

  • AT 53398 A
  • EP 9901249 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948635A1] The invention relates to a method for the continuous casting of a thin strip (1) using the two-roll method. According to said method molten metal (7) is cast into a casting slit (3), which is formed by two casting rolls (2) and corresponds to the thickness of the strip (1) to be cast, resulting in the formation of a molten bath (6). The surfaces (11) of the casting rolls (2) located above the molten bath (6) are rinsed with an inert gas or an inert gas mixture in accordance with the state of the surfaces (11) of the casting rolls (2). To avoid local thermal deformations, the surfaces (11) of the casting rolls (2) are observed along their entire length so as to detect local variations in their state. When local variations in state are detected, the gas rinsing of the surfaces (11) of the casting rolls (2) is carried out such that it differs locally in accordance with local variations observed along the entire length of the casting rolls (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0622 (2013.01); B22D 11/0697 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948635A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948635 A1 19990930; WO 9948635 A9 20020328; AT 223269 T 20020915; AT 408198 B 20010925; AT A53398 A 20010215; AU 3408899 A 19991018; AU 748269 B2 20020530; BR 9909031 A 20001205; CA 2325537 A1 19990930; CN 1092550 C 20021016; CN 1294536 A 20010509; DE 59902566 D1 20021010; DK 1068035 T3 20030106; EP 1068035 A1 20010117; EP 1068035 B1 20020904; ES 2184433 T3 20030401; JP 2002530196 A 20020917; JP 4745498 B2 20110810; MX PA00008456 A 20021213; PL 343161 A1 20010730; RU 2215614 C2 20031110; US 6575225 B1 20030610; ZA 9902288 B 19991004

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150226

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130226

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130226

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130227

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130226

2013-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223269 T

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-09-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120210

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120208

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-03-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100226

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-10-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050226

2004-02-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184433 T3

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-01-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902566 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223269 T 20020915

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE