Global patent index - EP 1068048 A1

EP 1068048 A1 2001-01-17 - PLATED GRINDING TOOL

Title (en)

PLATED GRINDING TOOL

Title (de)

LAMELLENSCHLEIFWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL ABRASIF A LAMELLES

Publication

EP 1068048 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916867 A

Priority

  • DE 19812515 A
  • EP 9901934 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812515A1] The grinder-blades (2) are positioned round the periphery and or end sides of the rotational axle (1) and are fixed to a support body (4) which has at least one rotationally symmetrical outer surface (6,10) onto which at least some of the grinder blades are fixed. At least one of the outer surfaces is parallel with the rotational axle or slopes at least by less then 80 degrees to the rotational axle. The support body has a central element (7) as disc and extending radially from the rotational axle. The grinder tool is connected to a drive mechanism by a central hole (5) and support surface (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/04; B24D 13/06; B24D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/04 (2006.01); B24D 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/14 (2013.01); B24D 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948647A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812515 A1 19990923; EP 1068048 A1 20010117; EP 1068048 B1 20041103; US 6866572 B1 20050315; WO 9948647 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LUEDCKE, JOACHIM MORITZ, DIPL.-ING., DE

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: JOACHIM MORITZ LUEDCKE, DE

2012-04-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LUEDCKE, JOACHIM MORITZ, DIPL.-ING., DE

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DIPL.-ING. GUENTER WENDT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT