Global Patent Index - EP 1068050 A1

EP 1068050 A1 2001-01-17 - ARTICULATED LEVER TENSIONING DEVICE

Title (en)

ARTICULATED LEVER TENSIONING DEVICE

Title (de)

KNIEHEBEL-SPANNVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE A GENOUILLERE

Publication

EP 1068050 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99958119 A

Priority

  • DE 29901363 U
  • EP 9909082 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6279887B1] A toggle lever clamping device has a bearing head (15) arranged on an actuating means (2), on which head a pivot unit (16), which comprises a clamping arm (22), may be moved between a release position and a clamping position. An abutment face (48) is provided on the bearing head (15) for presetting the clamping position of the clamping arm (22), such abutment being in the path of pivoting of the pivot unit (16) and serving for presetting the clamping position by cooperating with the pivot unit (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0044531A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901363 U1 19990506; EP 1068050 A1 20010117; EP 1068050 B1 20040818; US 6279887 B1 20010828; WO 0044531 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910286

- Effective date: 20130601

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111206

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101124

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910286 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030113

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000814

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE