Global patent index - EP 1068051 A1

EP 1068051 A1 2001-01-17 - HANDLE FOR A DRILL- AND/OR CHISEL HAMMER

Title (en)

HANDLE FOR A DRILL- AND/OR CHISEL HAMMER

Title (de)

HANDGRIFF FÜR EINEN BOHR- UND/ODER MEISSELHAMMER

Title (fr)

POIGNEE POUR MARTEAU PERFORATEUR ET/OU MARTEAU-BURINEUR

Publication

EP 1068051 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915710 A

Priority

  • DE 19814175 A
  • EP 9902060 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950030A1] The inventive handle for a drill- and/or chisel hammer has a mount (4) which can be fixed to the hammer (3). A radial grip (7) is fixed to said mount (4), the grip axis of said radial grip crossing a tool axis (5) which is defined by the position of a tool received by the hammer. A tangential grip (6) is also fixed to the mount (4). Said tangential grip (6) has a first grip section (8) whose grip axis is tangential to the tool axis (5) and a second grip section (9) whose grip axis is tangential to the tool axis (5) and essentially perpendicular to the grip axis of the first grip section (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/04 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/026 (2013.01); Y10S 81/12 (2013.01); Y10T 16/44 (2013.01); Y10T 16/4713 (2013.01); Y10T 16/498 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950030A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950030 A1 19991007; DE 19814175 C1 19991125; EP 1068051 A1 20010117; EP 1068051 B1 20030521; ES 2199568 T3 20040216; JP 2002509813 A 20020402; US 6484361 B1 20021126

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130327

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150710

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130327

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59905650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59905650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59905650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-02-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120208

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2199568

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES LI SE

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000821

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES LI SE