Global Patent Index - EP 1068053 A1

EP 1068053 A1 2001-01-17 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING BREAK-OFF COMPONENTS FROM A SHEET OF MATERIAL OR EQUIVALENT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REMOVING BREAK-OFF COMPONENTS FROM A SHEET OF MATERIAL OR EQUIVALENT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON AUSBRECHTEILEN AUS EINEM WERKSTOFFBOGEN ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ENLEVER LES PARTIES A DECORTIQUER D'UNE FEUILLE DE MATERIAU OU EQUIVALENT

Publication

EP 1068053 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919179 A

Priority

  • DE 19814736 A
  • DE 19820557 A
  • DE 19837316 A
  • DE 29815042 U
  • EP 9902266 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951405A1] The invention relates to a device for removing break-off pieces (12), especially waste parts, from a sheet of material containing blanks or similar flat pieces. An abutment device (20) which can move in a longitudinal direction is associated with a break-off tool (40, 42). The abutment device protrudes into a through opening (16). Even when said device is in a rest position it supports the break-off component or waste part of the sheet of material (10) in an approximately parallel position. When the waste part moves, its position can be modified by the break-off tool and brought into a specific angle of inclination in relation to the sheet of material, especially when the waste part is lowered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/1818 (2013.01); B26D 2007/1872 (2013.01); B26D 2007/1881 (2013.01); Y10T 225/30 (2015.04); Y10T 225/329 (2015.04); Y10T 225/371 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951405A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951405 A1 19991014; AT 269193 T 20040715; AT 316849 T 20060215; CA 2327083 A1 19991014; CN 1300246 A 20010620; DE 29825182 U1 20051222; DE 59913086 D1 20060413; EP 1068053 A1 20010117; EP 1068053 B1 20040616; JP 2002510561 A 20020409; US 6997363 B1 20060214

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909751

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130427

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOSSEN, FRANZ

- Free text: VOSSEN, FRANZ#STEISSLINGER STRASSE 46#D-78333 STOCKACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VOSSEN, FRANZ#STEISSLINGER STRASSE 46#D-78333 STOCKACH (DE)

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOSSEN FRANZ

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOSSEN FRANZ

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HIEBSCH & PEEGE AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909751 P 20040722

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL