Global Patent Index - EP 1068083 A1

EP 1068083 A1 2001-01-17 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING LAMINATE COATINGS, AND LAMINATE COATING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING LAMINATE COATINGS, AND LAMINATE COATING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON LAMINAT-BESCHICHTUNGEN UND LAMINAT-BESCHICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE RECOUVREMENTS STRATIFIE, ET RECOUVREMENT STRATIFIE

Publication

EP 1068083 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908834 A

Priority

EP 9900606 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044576A1] The invention relates to a method for producing laminate coatings, in particular, for floor plates. The floor plates comprise a decorative paper that is impregnated with an amino resin and comprise an abrasionproof covering layer which is arranged thereon and which is provided with particle-shaped, fine aluminum oxide (corundum). According to the inventive method, the particle-shaped aluminum oxide is spread onto the wet impregnated decorative paper before drying the same. The decorative paper treated in such a manner is then pre-dried or pre-condensed. After drying, a covering layer comprised of fibrous material containing melamine resin is applied to the pretreated decorative paper. Finally, the entire assembly is completely dried.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 5/04; D21H 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 5/04 (2006.01); D21H 27/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/28 (2013.01); B44C 5/043 (2013.01); B44C 5/0476 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0044576A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044576 A1 20000803; AT 251551 T 20031015; AU 2830799 A 20000818; CN 1094840 C 20021127; CN 1292754 A 20010425; CZ 20003383 A3 20010314; CZ 300493 B6 20090603; DE 59907294 D1 20031113; DK 1068083 T3 20040126; EP 1068083 A1 20010117; EP 1068083 B1 20031008; ES 2205781 T3 20040501; HK 1035168 A1 20030523; PL 188357 B1 20050131; PL 343240 A1 20010730; RU 2213668 C2 20031010; SI 1068083 T1 20040229; SK 14012000 A3 20010611; SK 285185 B6 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110127

2012-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120305

2012-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110126

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-10-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-09-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100101

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090915

2010-02-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100128 AND 20100203

2010-02-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100121 AND 20100127

2010-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DOUGLAS TECHNICAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-01-29 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG; CH

- Effective date: 20091210

2009-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL A.G.RUETIHOFSTRASSE 1, CH-9052

- Effective date: 20091218

2009-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL A.G.

- Effective date: 20091218

2009-12-30 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20090915

2009-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG

- Free text: KRONOSPAN TECHNICAL COMPANY LTD.#IASONOS STREET#NIKOSIA 1082 (CY) -TRANSFER TO- KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG#RUETIHOFSTRASSE 1#9052 NIEDERTEUFEN (CH)

2009-11-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG

- Effective date: 20090909

2009-09-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG

2009-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KRONOSPAN TECHNICAL COMPANY LTD.

- Free text: KRONOSPAN TECHNICAL COMPANY LTD.#IASONOS STREET#NIKOSIA 1082 (CY) -TRANSFER TO- KRONOSPAN TECHNICAL COMPANY LTD.#IASONOS STREET#NIKOSIA 1082 (CY)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040308

2005-09-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO.

2004-09-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205781 T3

2004-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031008

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-01-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-01-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040108

2004-01-07 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040107

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-06 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040106

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907294 P 20031113

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: IPTO AG

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-08 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-03-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010108;LT PAYMENT 20010108;LV PAYMENT 20010108;MK PAYMENT 20010108;RO PAYMENT 20010108;SI PAYMENT 20010108

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE