Global Patent Index - EP 1068116 A1

EP 1068116 A1 2001-01-17 - PEDAL MECHANISM

Title (en)

PEDAL MECHANISM

Title (de)

PEDALWERK

Title (fr)

PEDALE

Publication

EP 1068116 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914527 A

Priority

  • DE 19813845 A
  • EP 9901887 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813845A1] According to the invention, a pedal lever (2) which is foot actuated is connected to an actuating element (18) by means of a spring element (12) in such a way that an actuating force can be applied directly or by means of a component (13). The restoring force applied to the pedal lever (2) by a restoring spring element (6) is transmitted only up to a maximum permissible value. As soon as this value is exceeded, the spring element (12) absorbs the force which exceeds said value. As a result, the actuating element (18) is protected against damage which can be caused by excessive application of force during the restoring movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 7/06; B60R 21/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/09 (2006.01); B60T 7/06 (2006.01); G05G 1/32 (2008.04)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 5/03 (2013.01); G05G 1/00 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20528 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20534 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20888 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950110A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813845 A1 19991007; EP 1068116 A1 20010117; EP 1068116 B1 20020116; JP 2002509835 A 20020402; US 6722225 B1 20040420; WO 9950110 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050320

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050320

2004-05-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040517

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900639 20020221

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000819

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB