Global Patent Index - EP 1068121 A1

EP 1068121 A1 2001-01-17 - ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETVENTIL

Title (fr)

ELECTROVANNE

Publication

EP 1068121 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917873 A

Priority

  • DE 19814304 A
  • DE 19836494 A
  • EP 9902071 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6529106B1] The present invention relates to an electromagnetic valve of a cartridge-type construction comprised of a magnetic core, a magnetic armature (12) with valve closure member (4), and a valve seat member which form an operative unit in a valve housing, the said valve housing including a closed sleeve portion (1) which has a collar (17) on the opposite open end area for attachment in the valve housing. Inserted telescopically into the open end area of the sleeve portion (1) is a sleeve-shaped annular part (2) which carries the valve seat member (3) and aligns the latter concentrically in relation to the valve closure member (4) to form an operative unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 8/36; B60T 13/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/36 (2006.01); B60T 15/02 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 15/028 (2013.01); B60T 8/363 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950117A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6529106 B1 20030304; EP 1068121 A1 20010117; EP 1068121 B1 20020703; JP 2002510021 A 20020402; WO 9950117 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901933

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-12-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901933 20020808

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB