Global Patent Index - EP 1068134 A1

EP 1068134 A1 2001-01-17 - CONTAINER WITH CLOSURE

Title (en)

CONTAINER WITH CLOSURE

Title (de)

ZYLINDRISCHER BEHÄLTER MIT VERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT AVEC SA FERMETURE

Publication

EP 1068134 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99917955 A

Priority

  • EP 99917955 A
  • EP 9902274 W
  • EP 98106144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947439A1] The lid, designed to fit a basically cylindrical jar (7), has a cover (2) and a skirt (3) with an inner surface thread to engage with an external thread on the neck of the jar. The inner surface of the lid cover (1) has a series of three concentric lips (5, 6, 11) adjacent to the skirt to engage with the upper rim of the jar. The middle lip (11) being shorter than the outer and inner lips, which are spaced corresponding to the thickness of the rim.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/04; B65D 51/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/0421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951506A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947439 A1 19991006; AT 208328 T 20011115; AU 3604799 A 19991025; DE 69900435 D1 20011213; DE 69900435 T2 20020516; EP 1068134 A1 20010117; EP 1068134 B1 20011107; ES 2165235 T3 20020301; WO 9951506 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69900435

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165235 T3

2002-02-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900435 20011213

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208328 T 20011115

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JEANNIN, BERNARD

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE