Global Patent Index - EP 1068163 A1

EP 1068163 A1 2001-01-17 - SILICON CARBIDE MEMORY BOARD SUBSTRATE WITH A GERMANIUM AND SILICON COATING

Title (en)

SILICON CARBIDE MEMORY BOARD SUBSTRATE WITH A GERMANIUM AND SILICON COATING

Title (de)

SiC-SPEICHERPLATTENSUBSTRAT MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG AUS GERMANIUM UND SILICIUM

Title (fr)

SUBSTRAT DE CARTE MEMOIRE EN CARBURE DE SILICIUM, MUNI D'UN REVETEMENT EN GERMANIUM ET EN SILICIUM

Publication

EP 1068163 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914478 A

Priority

  • DE 19814890 A
  • EP 9901426 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814890A1] The invention relates to a substrate of sintered and coated silicon carbide, characterized in that the coating is an alloy and consists of between 80 and 95 % silicon and between 5 and 20 % germanium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 35/622; G11B 5/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/622 (2006.01); G11B 5/73 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/7315 (2013.01); C04B 35/62222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951540A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814890 A1 19991007; EP 1068163 A1 20010117; EP 1068163 B1 20010829; WO 9951540 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900227 20011004

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE