Global Patent Index - EP 1068172 A1

EP 1068172 A1 2001-01-17 - PLATELET AGGREGATION INHIBITION USING LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT HEPARIN IN COMBINATION WITH A GP IIb/IIIa ANTAGONIST

Title (en)

PLATELET AGGREGATION INHIBITION USING LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT HEPARIN IN COMBINATION WITH A GP IIb/IIIa ANTAGONIST

Title (de)

HEMMUNG DER BLUTPLÄTTCHENAGGREGATION DURCH NIEDERMOLEKULARGEWICHTIGES HEPARIN IN VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM GP IIb/IIIa ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

INHIBITION DE L'AGREGATION PLAQUETTAIRE AU MOYEN D'UNE COMBINAISON D'HEPARINE A FAIBLE POIDS MOLECULAIRE ET D'ANTAGONISTE DE RECEPTEUR DE GP IIb/IIIa

Publication

EP 1068172 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903499 A

Priority

  • GB 9809793 A
  • US 9902035 W
  • US 7342698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938827A1] A method for inhibiting platelet aggregation in a mammal comprising administering to the mammal a safe and therapeutically effective amount of a GP IIb/IIIa receptor antagonist or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof and a safe and therapeutically effective amount of low molecular weight heparin. A method for inhibiting platelet aggregation in a mammal comprising administering to the mammal a safe and therapeutically effective amount of (2-S-(n-butylsulfonylamino)-3[4-(piperidin-4-yl)butyloxyphenyl]-propionic acid or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof and a safe and therapeutically effective amount of low molecular weight heparin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4465 (2006.01); C07D 211/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/616 (2006.01); A61K 31/727 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/727 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/715 + A61K 31/60 + A61K 31/445
  2. A61K 31/727 + A61K 31/60 + A61K 31/445
  3. A61K 31/727 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938827 A1 19990805; AU 2350699 A 19990816; AU 740941 B2 20011115; CA 2318215 A1 19990805; EP 1068172 A1 20010117; EP 1068172 A4 20060927; JP 2002501936 A 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160308

2015-11-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/727 20060101ALI20150929BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/616 20060101ALI20150929BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 9/10 20060101ALI20150929BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 45/06 20060101ALI20150929BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/4465 20060101AFI20150929BHEP

2014-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORREVIO LLC

2013-12-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROKO CARDIO LLC

2010-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061212

2006-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060824

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000904;LT PAYMENT 20000904;LV PAYMENT 20000904;MK PAYMENT 20000904;RO PAYMENT 20000904;SI PAYMENT 20000904