Global patent index - EP 1068186 A2

EP 1068186 A2 2001-01-17 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR USE

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR USE

Title (de)

3-PYRIDYLALKOXYAMINE ODER ARYLOXYALKYLAMINE DERIVATE ALS CHOLINERGISCHE AGONISTEN

Title (fr)

PREPARATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET LEUR MODES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1068186 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99909644 A

Priority

  • US 9904235 W
  • US 5413098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951216A2] Patients susceptible to or suffering from conditions and disorders, such as central nervous system disorders, are treated by administering to a patient in need thereof aryloxyalkylamines, including pyridyloxylalkylamines and phenoxyalkylamines, such as (3-(3-pyridyloxy)propyl)methylamine and (3-(5-bromo(3-pyridyloxy))propyl)methylamine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 213/65; A61K 31/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/138 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4406 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/65 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/65 (2013.01); A61K 31/138 (2013.01); A61K 31/44 (2013.01); A61K 31/4406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951216A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951216 A2 19991014; WO 9951216 A3 19991118; AU 2880699 A 19991025; BR 9907170 A 20001226; CA 2317572 A1 19991014; EP 1068186 A2 20010117; JP 2002510619 A 20020409; MX PA00009619 A 20060309; US 2001014691 A1 20010816; US 6166047 A 20001226; US 6441006 B2 20020827; US 6441007 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TARGACEPT, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TARGACEPT, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000731

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE