Global Patent Index - EP 1068187 A1

EP 1068187 A1 2001-01-17 - PYRAZOLE INHIBITORS OF CYTOKINE PRODUCTION

Title (en)

PYRAZOLE INHIBITORS OF CYTOKINE PRODUCTION

Title (de)

PYRAZOLE ALS INHIBITOREN DER CYTOKINPRODUKTION

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE TYPE PYRAZOLE DE LA PRODUCTION DE CYTOKINE

Publication

EP 1068187 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99915341 A

Priority

  • US 9907766 W
  • US 5699698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951580A1] Compounds having formula (I) are useful for treating diseases that are prevented by or ameliorated with Interleukin-2, Interleukin-4, or Interleukin-5 production inhibitors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 231/16; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/42; A61K 31/425; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/475; C07D 401/04; C07D 401/10; C07D 401/14; C07D 403/10; C07D 405/10; C07D 405/14; C07D 409/04; C07D 409/10; C07D 413/10; C07D 417/10; C07D 417/14; C07D 495/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/4155 (2006.01); A61K 31/42 (2006.01); A61K 31/422 (2006.01); A61K 31/425 (2006.01); A61K 31/433 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/475 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 231/14 (2006.01); C07D 231/16 (2006.01); C07D 401/04 (2006.01); C07D 401/10 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/10 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/04 (2006.01); C07D 405/10 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/14 (2006.01); C07D 409/04 (2006.01); C07D 409/10 (2006.01); C07D 409/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/10 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/10 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01); C07D 495/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/04 (2013.01); C07D 231/16 (2013.01); C07D 401/10 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/10 (2013.01); C07D 405/10 (2013.01); C07D 405/14 (2013.01); C07D 409/04 (2013.01); C07D 409/10 (2013.01); C07D 413/10 (2013.01); C07D 417/10 (2013.01); C07D 417/14 (2013.01); C07D 495/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951580A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951580 A1 19991014; AU 3387999 A 19991025; CA 2327185 A1 19991014; EP 1068187 A1 20010117; JP 2002510679 A 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1037179

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021116

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020705

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BA MAUNG, NWE, Y.

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BASHA, ANWER

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DJURIC, STEVAN, W.

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUBBINS, EARL, J.

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LULY, JAY, R.

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TU, NOAH, P.

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MADAR, DAVID, J.

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WARRIOR, USHA

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BA MAUNG, NWE, Y.

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BASHA, ANWER

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DJURIC, STEVAN, W.

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUBBINS, EARL, J.

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LULY, JAY, R.

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TU, NOAH, P.

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MADAR, DAVID, J.

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WARRIOR, USHA

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BA MAUNG, NWE, Y.

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BASHA, ANWER

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DJURIC, STEVAN, W.

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUBBINS, EARL, J.

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LULY, JAY, R.

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TU, NOAH, P.

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MADAR, DAVID, J.

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WARRIOR, USHA

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE