Global patent index - EP 1068231 A2

EP 1068231 A2 2001-01-17 - HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES OF NORMAL OVARY TISSUE

Title (en)

HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES OF NORMAL OVARY TISSUE

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHE NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN AUS OVARNORMALGEWEBE

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES HUMAINES EXTRAITES DES TISSUS SAINS D'OVAIRES

Publication

EP 1068231 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99944132 A

Priority

  • DE 9901070 W
  • DE 19816395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19816395A1] The invention relates to human nucleic acid sequences - mRNA, cDNA, genomic sequences - of normal ovary tissue, coding for genetic products or parts thereof. The invention also relates to the use thereof. The invention further relates to polypeptides that can be obtained using said sequences and to the use thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/335; C12N 15/00; G01N 33/574

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); G01N 33/57449 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951727A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19816395 A1 19991007; EP 1068231 A2 20010117; JP 2002510486 A 20020409; WO 9951727 A2 19991014; WO 9951727 A3 20000706

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HINZMANN, BERND, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE, PROF.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPECHT, THOMAS, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PILARSKY, CHRISTIAN, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAHL, EDGAR, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/335 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/574 B

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 B

2003-09-17 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20030627

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METAGEN PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE