Global Patent Index - EP 1068285 A1

EP 1068285 A1 2001-01-17 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CONCENTRATES WITH HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT DISPERSANTS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CONCENTRATES WITH HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT DISPERSANTS

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN VON DISPERGIERMITTEL ENTHALTENDE KONZENTRATE MIT HOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CONCENTRES CONTENANT DES DISPERSANTS DE MASSE MOLECULAIRE ELEVEE

Publication

EP 1068285 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916558 A

Priority

  • GB 9807733 A
  • US 9907794 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952999A1] Concentrates for lubricating oil compositions are prepared by mixing at elevated temperature: (i) at least one high molecular weight ashless dispersant; (ii) at least one oil-soluble overbased metal detergent; and (iii) at least one other concentrate additive provided that the additive is first mixed with the detergent or the dispersant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 171/06; C10M 163/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 171/06 (2006.01); C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10M 129/93 (2006.01); C10M 133/54 (2006.01); C10M 143/06 (2006.01); C10M 159/20 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01); C10M 177/00 (2006.01); C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/24 (2006.01); C10L 1/26 (2006.01); C10L 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10L 1/143 (2013.01); C10M 171/00 (2013.01); C10M 177/00 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1828 (2013.01); C10L 1/188 (2013.01); C10L 1/1886 (2013.01); C10L 1/189 (2013.01); C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 1/1963 (2013.01); C10L 1/1973 (2013.01); C10L 1/198 (2013.01); C10L 1/2225 (2013.01); C10L 1/233 (2013.01); C10L 1/238 (2013.01); C10L 1/2383 (2013.01); C10L 1/2387 (2013.01); C10L 1/2412 (2013.01); C10L 1/2437 (2013.01); C10L 1/2616 (2013.01); C10L 1/265 (2013.01); C10L 1/303 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/16 (2013.01); C10M 2207/26 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/24 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2217/042 (2013.01); C10M 2217/043 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/088 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2223/065 (2013.01); C10M 2223/12 (2013.01); C10M 2225/04 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 163/00 + C10M 133/52 + C10M 133/56 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 159/20 + C10M 159/22 + C10M 159/24

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952999A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952999 A1 19991021; AU 3485599 A 19991101; CA 2327829 A1 19991021; CA 2327829 C 20070626; EP 1068285 A1 20010117; EP 1068285 B1 20111123; GB 9807733 D0 19980610; JP 2002511519 A 20020416; JP 4675478 B2 20110420

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69943874

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120409

2012-12-27 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69943874

- Effective date: 20120824

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120409

2012-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69943874

2012-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120824

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111123

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111123

2012-03-07 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20111123

2012-02-02 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69943874

- Effective date: 20120202

2011-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2011-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEUM USA L.P.

2011-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 171/06 20060101AFI20110427BHEP

2011-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 163/00 20060101ALI20110427BHEP

2011-05-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 171/06 20060101AFI20110419BHEP

2011-05-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 163/00 20060101ALI20110419BHEP

2008-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CONCENTRATES WITH HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT DISPERSANTS

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040504

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL