Global Patent Index - EP 1068295 A1

EP 1068295 A1 2001-01-17 - CELL DIFFERENTIATION/PROLIFERATION AND MAINTENANCE FACTOR AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

CELL DIFFERENTIATION/PROLIFERATION AND MAINTENANCE FACTOR AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

ZELL-DIFFERENZIERUNGS/PROLIFERATIONS- UND ERHALTUNGSFAKTOR UND SEINE VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

FACTEUR DE DIFFERENTIATION/DE PROLIFERATION ET DE CONSERVATION DES CELLULES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 1068295 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914359 A

Priority

  • AU 9900265 W
  • AU PP291298 A
  • AU PP609798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953021A1] The present invention relates to a biologically active factor capable of influencing differentiation, proliferation and/or maintenance of pluripotent cells. The present invention also relates to methods of using the biologically active factor to produce from pluripotent cells, pluripotent cells having different properties, more particularly EPL cells; and to methods of producing partially or terminally differentiated cells from the pluripotent cells. The present invention also relates to pluripotent cells and partially or terminally differentiated cells, and their uses in human cell and gene therapy, and transgenic animal production.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/38; C07K 14/78; C12N 5/06; C12N 5/16; C12N 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C07K 5/078 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/78 (2006.01); C12N 1/38 (2006.01); C12N 5/0735 (2010.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/877 (2010.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8775 (2013.01); C07K 14/475 (2013.01); C07K 14/78 (2013.01); C12N 5/0606 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2500/32 (2013.01); C12N 2501/113 (2013.01); C12N 2501/115 (2013.01); C12N 2501/119 (2013.01); C12N 2501/15 (2013.01); C12N 2501/58 (2013.01); C12N 2501/83 (2013.01); C12N 2501/998 (2013.01); C12N 2502/14 (2013.01); C12N 2506/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953021 A1 19991021; WO 9953021 A9 20000504; CA 2324591 A1 19991021; EP 1068295 A1 20010117; EP 1068295 A4 20020821; IL 138502 D0 20011031; JP 2002517982 A 20020625; NZ 507103 A 20021025

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034741

2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061101

2005-05-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRESAGEN INC.

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041122

2002-08-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 1/38 A, 7C 12N 5/06 B, 7C 12N 5/16 B, 7C 12N 5/22 B, 7C 07K 14/78 B, 7A 01K 67/027 B

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BETTESS, MICHAEL, DAVID

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RATHJEN, PETER, DAVID

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RATHJEN, JOY

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAKE, JULIE-ANNE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE