Global Patent Index - EP 1068304 A1

EP 1068304 A1 2001-01-17 - TREATMENT OF PARASITIC DISEASES BY INHIBITION OF CYSTEINE PROTEASES OF THE PAPAIN SUPERFAMILY

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF PARASITIC DISEASES BY INHIBITION OF CYSTEINE PROTEASES OF THE PAPAIN SUPERFAMILY

Title (de)

BAHANDLUNG PARASITÄRER KRANKHEITEN DURCH HEMMUNG VON CYSTEINPROTEASEN DER PAPAIN-ÜBERFAMILIE

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES PARASITAIRES PAR L'INHIBITION DES CYSTEINE-PROTEASES DE LA SUPERFAMILLE DE LA PAPAINE

Publication

EP 1068304 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916517 A

Priority

  • US 9907723 W
  • US 8122198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953039A1] The present invention relates to compounds and pharmaceutical compositions which inhibit proteases, such as cysteine proteases. In particular, the present invention relates to compounds and pharmaceutical compositions which inhibit cysteine proteases of the papain superfamily. The compounds and pharmaceutical compositions of the present invention are useful for treating diseases, particularly parasitic diseases, which are mediated by such proteases. In particular, the present invention relates to a method of treating malaria by inhibiting the cysteine protease falcipain.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/99; A01N 33/26; A01N 37/18; A01N 43/78; C07C 241/00; C07D 277/60; C07D 401/00; C07D 413/00; C12N 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 31/27 (2006.01); A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4402 (2006.01); A61K 31/4418 (2006.01); A61K 31/4436 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/501 (2006.01); A61K 31/5375 (2006.01); A61P 33/02 (2006.01); A61P 33/06 (2006.01); A61P 33/10 (2006.01); A61P 33/12 (2006.01); C07C 281/06 (2006.01); C07C 311/29 (2006.01); C07D 207/24 (2006.01); C07D 207/273 (2006.01); C07D 213/56 (2006.01); C07D 295/215 (2006.01); C07D 307/22 (2006.01); C07D 307/33 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C12N 9/99 (2006.01); C07D 207/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 207/273 (2013.01); C07C 281/06 (2013.01); C07C 311/29 (2013.01); C07D 213/56 (2013.01); C07D 295/215 (2013.01); C07D 307/22 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953039 A1 19991021; AR 020065 A1 20020410; AU 3482099 A 19991101; CA 2327282 A1 19991021; CN 1304447 A 20010718; CO 5080800 A1 20010925; DZ 2752 A1 20030915; EP 1068304 A1 20010117; EP 1068304 A4 20010509; HU 0101513 A2 20010828; IL 138628 D0 20011031; JP 2002511491 A 20020416; MA 26618 A1 20041220; NO 20005032 A 20001116; NO 20005032 D0 20001006; PE 04212000 A1 20000521; PL 343373 A1 20010813; TR 200002940 T2 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034099

2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-05-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 9/99 A, 7C 12N 9/48 B, 7A 01N 43/78 B, 7A 01N 37/18 B, 7A 01N 33/26 B, 7C 07D 413/00 B, 7C 07D 401/00 B, 7C 07D 277/60 B, 7C 07C 241/00 B, 7C 07C 281/06 B, 7C 07C 311/29 B

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001002

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001002