Global Patent Index - EP 1068314 A1

EP 1068314 A1 2001-01-17 - HIGHLY ACTIVE FORMS OF INTERFERON REGULATORY FACTOR PROTEINS

Title (en)

HIGHLY ACTIVE FORMS OF INTERFERON REGULATORY FACTOR PROTEINS

Title (de)

HOCHWIRKSAME FORME VON INTERFERON REGULATIONSFAKTOR PROTEINE

Title (fr)

FORMES HAUTEMENT ACTIVES DE PROTEINES DU FACTEUR DE REGULATION DE L'INTERFERON

Publication

EP 1068314 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914389 A

Priority

  • CA 9900314 W
  • CA 2234588 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951737A1] The present invention relates to IRF proteins that have been modified in the carboxy-terminus domain (transactivation domain) by modification of serine and/or threonine sites. Modification may be achieved by phosphorylation of serine and/or threonine, or by replacement of serine and/or threonine residues with residues having acidic side-chains, preferably carboxylic acid-containing side-chains, such as aspartic acid or glutamic acid residues. Such modified proteins may be mutants of IRF-3 and IRF-7, including chimeric proteins having portions of both IRF-3 and IRF-7, and post-translationally modified (phosphorylated) IRF-3 protein, the phosphorylation being induced by Sendai virus infection. More specifically, the present invention provides a modified interferon regulatory factor (IRF) protein, the protein comprising at least one modified serine or threonine phosphoacceptor site in the carboxy-terminus domain, preferably wherein cytokine gene activation by the modified IRF is increased relative to cytokine gene activation by a corresponding wild type IRF protein. The invention also provides for pharmaceutical compositions containing IRF protein, and uses of the protein, nucleotide sequence encoding it, and pharmaceutical compositions containing it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/47; C07K 19/00; C12N 15/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/16 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 31/22 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4702 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951737A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951737 A1 19991014; AU 3324899 A 19991025; CA 2234588 A1 19991007; EP 1068314 A1 20010117; IL 138921 D0 20011125; JP 2002510489 A 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070503

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041008

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIR MORTIMER B. DAVIS JEWISH GENERAL HOSPITAL

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HISCOTT, JOHN

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIN, RONGTUAN

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE