Global patent index - EP 1068343 A1

EP 1068343 A1 2001-01-17 - PREPARATION OF RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUS CARRYING A REP GENE OF ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS

Title (en)

PREPARATION OF RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUS CARRYING A REP GENE OF ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG EINES REKOMBINANTEN ADENOVIRUS, DAS DAS REP-GEN DES ADENO-ASSOZIIERTEN VIRUS ENTHÄLT

Title (fr)

PREPARATION D'ADENOVIRUS RECOMBINES PORTANT UN GENE REP DE VIRUS ADENO-ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1068343 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922090 A

Priority

  • EP 9902384 W
  • GB 9813670 A
  • IT 9800082 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953084A1] Adenoviral particles are produced by incubating cells containing a helper adenovirus vector and a helper-dependent adenoviral vector including an Adeno-Associated Virus (AAV) rep gene, such as rep78. Cells are provided containing a helper adenovirus vector. A helper-dependent adenoviral vector including an AAV rep gene is introduced into the cells, for instance by infection with infective viral particles. The cells are incubated to produce adenoviral particles containing nucleic acid including the AAV rep gene. Advantageously, cells containing helper adenovirus vector are pre-incubated for 0.5-12 hours, preferably about 4 hours, to allow expression of viral proteins required for adenoviral genome replication before introducing the helper-dependent adenovirus vector including an AAV rep gene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/861 (2006.01); C12N 15/864 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10344 (2013.01); C12N 2750/14143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953084A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953084 A1 19991021; AU 3926599 A 19991101; AU 752811 B2 20021003; CA 2326847 A1 19991021; EP 1068343 A1 20010117; GB 9813670 D0 19980826

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080411

2007-12-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CILIBERTO, GENNARO,I

2007-12-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COLLOCA, STEFANO,I

2007-12-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LA MONICA, NICOLA,I

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031201

2005-08-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ISTITUTO DI RICERCHE DI BIOLOGIA MOLECOLARE P.ANGE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031201

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE