Global Patent Index - EP 1068364 A1

EP 1068364 A1 2001-01-17 - METHOD FOR ALLOYING STEELS AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ALLOYING STEELS AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM LEGIEREN VON STÄHLEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'ALLIAGE D'ACIERS ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EXECUTION DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1068364 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924705 A

Priority

  • DE 9900932 W
  • DE 19814748 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814748A1] The invention relates to a method for alloying steels by introducing metallic auxiliaries and/or reducing agents into liquid molten metal in powder form. The invention also relates to a device for carrying out this method. The alloying auxiliaries and/or the alloying auxiliaries and reduction agents are conveyed in powder form from a supply container to one or more lances and/or sub-bath nozzles via a delivery line, and introduced into the melt directly or in a mixture with a fluidisation agent, said fluidisation agent making up </=20 % of the quantity blown in. The pressure required for this is at least 20 bar. Alternatively, the powder can be introduced into the melt using a plunger covering the cross-section of the delivery line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 7/00; B65G 53/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/0037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951785A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814748 A1 19991007; AT 209260 T 20011215; EP 1068364 A1 20010117; EP 1068364 B1 20011121; ES 2168015 T3 20020516; US 6383253 B1 20020507; WO 9951785 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030328

2004-03-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EGON EVERTZ K.G. (G.M.B.H. & CO.)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168015 T3

2002-03-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020322

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-03-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-03-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-03-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020307

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-03-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900687 20020221

2002-01-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209260 T 20011215

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000725

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE