Global Patent Index - EP 1068378 A1

EP 1068378 A1 2001-01-17 - DRAWING OF POLYESTER FILAMENTS

Title (en)

DRAWING OF POLYESTER FILAMENTS

Title (de)

VERSTRECKUNG VON POLYESTERFILAMENTEN

Title (fr)

ETIREMENT DE FILAMENTS DE POLYESTER

Publication

EP 1068378 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913243 A

Priority

US 9806154 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950483A1] Simultaneous drawing of mixed polyester filaments is improved by use of chain-branched polyester for the polymer from which the polyester filaments are spun.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/62; D01D 5/08; D01D 5/253

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/08 (2006.01); D01D 5/253 (2006.01); D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D02J 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/253 (2013.01); D01D 5/082 (2013.01); D01F 6/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950483A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950483 A1 19991007; AU 6783898 A 19991018; DE 69827045 D1 20041118; DE 69827045 T2 20050908; EP 1068378 A1 20010117; EP 1068378 B1 20041013; ES 2230684 T3 20050501; JP 2002509995 A 20020402; PT 1068378 E 20050228; TW 567255 B 20031221

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-12-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69827045

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-03-31 [PGRI PT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Effective date: 20091016

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-10-28 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Free text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20091016

2009-10-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2006-06-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ADVANSA BV, NL

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-06-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-04-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230684 T3

2005-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69827045 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT PT