Global Patent Index - EP 1068379 A1

EP 1068379 A1 2001-01-17 - IMPROVING COMFORT BY MIXING DENIERS

Title (en)

IMPROVING COMFORT BY MIXING DENIERS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTER KOMFORT DURCH DENIERMISCHUNG

Title (fr)

AMELIORATION DU CONFORT PAR LE MELANGE DE DENIERS

Publication

EP 1068379 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913242 A

Priority

US 9806153 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950484A1] Comfort properties of fibers of longitudinally-grooved fibers of scalloped-oval cross section are improved by providing such fibers as a mixture of different dpf and using a cationic-dyeable alkali metal sulfonate isophthalate salt copolyester that is also modified with a chain-brancher so that the filaments of different dpf can be drawn simultaneously.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/84; D01D 5/08; D01D 5/253

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/08 (2006.01); D01D 5/253 (2006.01); D01F 6/84 (2006.01); D02J 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/84 (2013.01); D01D 5/082 (2013.01); D01D 5/253 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950484A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950484 A1 19991007; AU 6783798 A 19991018; DE 69810818 D1 20030220; DE 69810818 T2 20031113; EP 1068379 A1 20010117; EP 1068379 B1 20030115; ES 2190070 T3 20030716; JP 2002509996 A 20020402; JP 4252213 B2 20090408; MY 118588 A 20041231; PT 1068379 E 20030331; TW 438920 B 20010607

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140626 AND 20140702

2014-07-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INVISTA TECHNOLOGIES S.A.R.L., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ADVANSA BV, HOOFDDORP, NL

- Document: DE 69810818

- Effective date: 20140604

2014-07-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69810818

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE ZELLENTIN & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20140604

2014-07-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69810818

- Representative's name: ZELLENTIN & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140604

2014-06-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69810818

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE ZELLENTIN & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-02-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: INVISTA TECHNOLOGIES S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20140129

2014-01-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INVISTA TECHNOLOGIES S.A R.L., CH

- Effective date: 20140102

2013-12-23 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: INVISTA TECHNOLOGIES S.A.R.L., CH

- Effective date: 20131216

2010-03-31 [PGRI PT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Effective date: 20091023

2009-10-30 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Free text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20091023

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-10-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2006-06-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ADVANSA BV, NL

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-06-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-04-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190070 T3

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030121

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810818 P 20030220

2003-02-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020529

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT PT