Global Patent Index - EP 1068385 A1

EP 1068385 A1 2001-01-17 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SEAMS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SEAMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NÄHNÄHTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES COUTURES

Publication

EP 1068385 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919103 A

Priority

  • DE 9900797 W
  • DE 19813887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813887A1] The method and devices currently used to sew textiles, causing the sewing thread to fully penetrate the material to be sewn, require mechanical elements forming the stitches that are placed on both sides of the plane of the material to be sewn. This causes manipulation, mechanical and space-related problems when sewing large materials that should not be creased. The inventive method and the new device make it possible to sew the material in a one-sided operation and require minimum space. In order to produce the seam, two or more sewing needles (1,5) alternatively penetrate the entire sewing material (3). The loop (4) formed by a sewing thread is taken up by the next penetrating needle (5) and untied. The following penetrating needle then transfers the loops of the sewing thread. The sewing needles move three-dimensionally. The method and the device are suitable for sewing large, curved material that should not be creased, for example, reinforcement fabrics for fiber reinforced materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 3/02; D04B 23/10; D05B 1/10; D05B 1/24; D05B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 23/10 (2006.01); D05B 1/10 (2006.01); D05B 1/24 (2006.01); D05B 3/02 (2006.01); D05B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 23/10 (2013.01); D05B 1/10 (2013.01); D05B 1/24 (2013.01); D05B 3/02 (2013.01); D05B 23/00 (2013.01); D10B 2505/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950492A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813887 A1 19990930; AU 3700099 A 19991018; DE 19980552 D2 20010517; EP 1068385 A1 20010117; EP 1068385 B1 20021023; US 6357371 B1 20020319; WO 9950492 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070320

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MOLL KLAUS-UWE

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060320

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MOLL KLAUS-UWE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040324

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903170 20021128

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL