Global Patent Index - EP 1068394 A1

EP 1068394 A1 2001-01-17 - METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING DECORATIVE PAPERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING DECORATIVE PAPERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM IMPRÄGNIEREN VON DEKORPAPIEREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR IMPREGNER DES PAPIERS DECORATIFS

Publication

EP 1068394 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99973654 A

Priority

EP 9900604 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1270811A1] Decorative paper for use in high abrasion resistant laminate flooring is impregnated by an amine resin. The paper has an additional layer of amine resin. The layer weighs 100-250% of the dry weight of the paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 5/04 (2006.01); D21H 27/28 (2006.01); D21H 19/26 (2006.01); D21H 19/62 (2006.01); D21H 19/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 5/0476 (2013.01); D21H 27/28 (2013.01); D21H 19/26 (2013.01); D21H 19/62 (2013.01); D21H 19/826 (2013.01); Y10T 428/25 (2013.01); Y10T 428/277 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31993 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0044984A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29917947 U1 20000309; AT 254692 T 20031215; AU 3252099 A 20000818; CN 100523375 C 20090805; CN 1292840 A 20010425; DE 59907803 D1 20031224; EP 1068394 A1 20010117; EP 1068394 B1 20031119; EP 1270811 A1 20030102; EP 1270811 B1 20031217; HK 1035219 A1 20091218; PT 1068394 E 20040331; PT 1270811 E 20040430; SK 14002000 A3 20010611; SK 286684 B6 20090305; US 2006134405 A1 20060622; US 6835421 B1 20041228; US 7569270 B2 20090804; WO 0044984 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20031119

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20031119

2010-01-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20091016

2010-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-01-11 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20100106

2009-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL A.G.RUETIHOFSTRASSE 1, CH-9052

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20091218

2009-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20091218

2009-12-24 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DOUGLAS TECHNICAL LIMITED, GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20091217

2009-12-24 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20091217

2009-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040730

2008-07-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: VITS SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20040813

2008-07-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DEKOR-KUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040816

2008-07-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BASF SE

- Effective date: 20040819

2008-07-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DAKOR MELAMIN IMPRAEGNIERUNGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20040819

2006-11-22 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: D21H 23/72 20060101AFI20061013BHEP

2006-11-22 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: D21H 23/56 20060101ALI20061013BHEP

2006-11-22 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: D21H 23/50 20060101ALI20061013BHEP

2006-11-22 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: D21H 17/51 20060101ALI20061013BHEP

2006-11-22 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: D21H 27/18 20060101ALI20061013BHEP

2006-04-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040730

2006-04-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: VITS SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20040813

2006-04-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DEKOR-KUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040816

2006-04-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT PATENTE, MARKEN UND LIZENZ

- Effective date: 20040819

2006-04-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DAKOR MELAMIN IMPRAEGNIERUNGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20040819

2005-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040730

2005-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VITS SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20040813

2005-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DEKOR-KUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040816

2005-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFTPATENTE, MARKEN UND LIZENZE

- Effective date: 20040819

2005-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DAKOR MELAMIN IMPRAEGNIERUNGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20040819

2005-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UNILIN FLOORING N.V.

- Effective date: 20050725

2004-10-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-10-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VITS SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-10-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DEKOR-KUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-10-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFTPATENTE, MARKEN UND LIZENZE

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-10-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DAKOR MELAMIN IMPRAEGNIERUNGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-10-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-10-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VITS SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-10-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DEKOR-KUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-09-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-05-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20031119

2004-05-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-04-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

- Effective date: 20031119

2004-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-03-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DIETLIN & CIE SA

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-03-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20010108;LT PAYMENT 20010108;LV PAYMENT 20010108;MK PAYMENT 20010108;RO PAYMENT 20010108;SI PAYMENT 20010108

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE