Global patent index - EP 1068397 A1

EP 1068397 A1 2001-01-17 - SLIP-FORM PAVER

Title (en)

SLIP-FORM PAVER

Title (de)

GLEITSCHALUNGSFERTIGER

Title (fr)

MACHINE A COFFRAGES GLISSANTS

Publication

EP 1068397 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915531 A

Priority

  • DE 19814052 A
  • EP 9901129 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814052A1] The invention relates to a slip-form paver with a tractor (2) comprised of a machine frame (4) having longitudinal beams (8) which run parallel to the working direction. Traveling devices (14) are arranged on the ends of said longitudinal beams. The slip-form paver also comprises telescopic transverse beams (18) which run perpendicular to the working direction and which are provided for variably adjusting the working width. Working devices which are fastened to the machine frame (4) can be adapted to different working widths. According to the invention, the machine frame (4) comprises a base frame (20) in which the telescopic transverse beams (18) are mounted. In addition, a subframe (24) is arranged under the base frame (20). The distance from the subframe to the base frame (20) can be adjusted. A working device which is subdivided over the working width and which can be adapted to the same without requiring assembly is fastened to the subframe (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/40 (2013.01); E01C 2301/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950503A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814052 A1 19991014; EP 1068397 A1 20010117; EP 1068397 B1 20040804; EP 1213389 A1 20020612; EP 1213389 B1 20050803; US 6471442 B1 20021029; WO 9950503 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910140

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030513

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL