Global patent index - EP 1068398 A1

EP 1068398 A1 2001-01-17 - DEVICE FOR MILLING OFF GROUND SURFACES, ESPECIALLY ROADWAYS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MILLING OFF GROUND SURFACES, ESPECIALLY ROADWAYS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABFRÄSEN VON BODENFLÄCHEN, INSBESONDERE FAHRBAHNEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ENLEVER PAR FRAISAGE DES SURFACES DE SOL, NOTAMMENT SUR DES CHAUSSEES

Publication

EP 1068398 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916834 A

Priority

  • DE 19814053 A
  • EP 9901834 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814053A1] The invention relates to a device for milling off ground surfaces (2), especially roadways, having a chassis (4) which supports a machine frame (6). The inventive device also comprises a milling roller (8) which is mounted in the machine frame (6) and which extends in a perpendicular manner in relation to the direction of motion. The device has at least one conveying device (10) which is arranged in the direction of motion in front of the milling roller (8) and which is provided for transporting away the material which is milled off. In addition, the inventive device comprises a roller casing (18) having a passage opening (22) for the milled off material. Said passage opening faces the conveying device (10). According to the invention, the end of the conveying device (10) located on the side of the milling roller is mounted in a belt shoe (16) which is fastened on the machine frame (6) such that the height of the belt shoe can be adjusted. In addition, the belt shoe (16) and the conveying device (10) form a rigid unit such that they do not pivot in relation to one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 23/088

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/08 (2006.01); E01C 23/088 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950504A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814053 A1 19991007; DE 19814053 B4 20070726; AT 304631 T 20050915; AU 3518599 A 19991018; AU 755952 B2 20030102; BR 9909188 A 20001205; DE 59912560 D1 20051020; EP 1068398 A1 20010117; EP 1068398 B1 20050914; ES 2248996 T3 20060316; JP 2002510000 A 20020402; JP 4106183 B2 20080625; NO 20004656 A 20001124; NO 20004656 D0 20000919; NO 319428 B1 20050808; US 6457779 B1 20021001; WO 9950504 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2248996

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-12-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912560

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010625

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE