Global Patent Index - EP 1068400 A1

EP 1068400 A1 2001-01-17 - SEPARATOR AND PROTECTIVE OR DELIMITING BARRIER, FOR EXAMPLE FOR VEHICLE ROAD TRAFFIC

Title (en)

SEPARATOR AND PROTECTIVE OR DELIMITING BARRIER, FOR EXAMPLE FOR VEHICLE ROAD TRAFFIC

Title (de)

TRENNENDE UND SCHÜTZENDE ODER BEGRENZENDE BARRIERE, BEISPIELSWEISE FÜR DEN STRASSENVERKEHR

Title (fr)

SEPARATEUR ET BARRIERE DE PROTECTION OU DE DELIMITATION, PAR EXEMPLE POUR VOIE DE CIRCULATION AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1068400 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99945689 A

Priority

  • FR 9900827 W
  • FR 9804781 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777304A1] The invention concerns a separator for producing protective or delimiting road barriers, with an oblong horizontal section and comprising a cylindro-convex end (4) and a cylindro-concave end (5) for articulated interlocking or cylindrical articulation with the cylindro-concave end, respectively, of identical or similar neighbouring separators. Said separator comprises, at each of its ends (4, 5) at least a passage or orifice (6) allowing through at least a flexible link (7) for connecting it to a set of identical or similar separators for producing a barrier. The invention is characterised in that it consists of a hollow and empty body capable of containing a shock-absorbing air volume. The invention also concerns the protective or delimiting barriers constituted with such separators.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/088 (2013.01); E01F 15/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953145A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777304 A1 19991015; FR 2777304 B1 20000623; AT 234969 T 20030415; AU 5265899 A 19991101; CA 2324941 A1 19991021; CA 2324941 C 20060131; DE 69906039 D1 20030424; DE 69906039 T2 20040108; DK 1068400 T3 20030721; EP 1068400 A1 20010117; EP 1068400 B1 20030319; ES 2194506 T3 20031116; PT 1068400 E 20030829; US 6439801 B1 20020827; WO 9953145 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160415

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160415

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160308

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-11-21 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194506 T3

2003-07-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2003-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906039 P 20030424

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-04-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-07-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROTECTIVE OR DELIMITING BARRIER, FOR EXAMPLE FOR VEHICLE ROAD TRAFFIC

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GALIANA, RAPHAEL

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GALIANA, RAPHAEL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE