Global Patent Index - EP 1068416 A1

EP 1068416 A1 2001-01-17 - MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR STOP

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR STOP

Title (de)

KRAFTWAGENTÜRFESTSTELLER

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'ARRET POUR PORTIERES DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1068416 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907300 A

Priority

  • DE 9900262 W
  • DE 19814940 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814940A1] The invention relates to a motor vehicle door stop essentially comprised of a first part which acts upon a door assembly part, a door, or a door pillar, and of a second part which acts upon another door assembly part. The door stop also comprises at least one braking and holding body which is arranged between both parts and which is spring-loaded by at least one spring (4). One of both parts is formed by an element which can move in relation to the other part, is arranged in a distributed manner which corresponds with the intended holding positions of the doors. In addition, said element is provided with brake ramps or catching notches (8) which interact with the spring-loaded braking or holding bodies. In order to prevent the door stop from becoming noisy after having been used over a long period of time, the invention provides that the spring (4) which interacts with a braking or holding body is surface-hardened at least in the area where it comes into contact with the braking or holding body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/20 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/1042 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951841A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814940 A1 19991014; AU 2712199 A 19991025; BR 9909374 A 20011218; CN 1296545 A 20010523; CZ 20003586 A3 20020612; DE 19980601 D2 20010510; EP 1068416 A1 20010117; EP 1068416 B1 20010822; ES 2163326 T3 20020116; JP 2002510764 A 20020409; MX PA00009687 A 20020702; PT 1068416 E 20020228; WO 9951841 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EDSCHA ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ED. SCHARWAECHTER GMBH, 42855 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 59900210

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900210

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2005-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050128

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-08-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011119

2002-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163326 T3

2002-01-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020102

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011226

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-12-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900210 20010927

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE