Global Patent Index - EP 1068417 A1

EP 1068417 A1 2001-01-17 - DOOR STOP WHICH IS INTEGRATED WITH A DEMOUNTABLE DOOR HINGE

Title (en)

DOOR STOP WHICH IS INTEGRATED WITH A DEMOUNTABLE DOOR HINGE

Title (de)

MIT EINEM AUSHÄNGBAREN TÜRSCHARNIER BAULICH VEREINIGTER TÜRFESTSTELLER

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'ARRET DE PORTIERE INTEGRE A UNE CHARNIERE DE PORTIERE DEMONTABLE

Publication

EP 1068417 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914396 A

Priority

  • DE 9900259 W
  • DE 19814593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814593A1] The invention relates to a door stop for motor vehicle doors which is integrated with a demountable door hinge. The door hinge is comprised of two hinge halves (1, 2) and a hinge pin (3) which is accommodated in the hinge half (2) with a running fit and in the other hinge half (1) such that it can be lifted off without turning The door stop comprises braking or holding means which are radially aligned in relation to the hinge pin axis and which interact with stopping means concentrically arranged in relation to the hinge pin axis. The door stop assembly is primarily accommodated in a door stop housing (12). Said door stop housing is placed on the respective hinge half (2) in an axial projection (11) of the hinge axis. The hinge pin is mounted with a running fit in the hinge half (2). According to the invention, the hinge pin (3) is connected to a complimentary non-circular form of the inner peripheral wall of the door stop housing (12) which is connected to the respective hinge half (2) whose knuckle intersperses the hinge pin with bearing clearance. Said hinge pin comprises a curvature contour of the cross-section thereof, said contour deviating from the pure circular form, over at least part of the longitudinal area (11) of the hinge pin which engages inside the door stop housing (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/10; E05D 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/08 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/084 (2013.01); E05D 11/1057 (2013.01); E05D 2011/1035 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54038 (2013.01); Y10T 16/557 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951845A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814593 A1 19991014; AU 3325299 A 19991025; BR 9909319 A 20011120; CN 1295644 A 20010516; CZ 20003588 A3 20011212; DE 19980604 D2 20010510; EP 1068417 A1 20010117; EP 1068417 B1 20020410; JP 2002510766 A 20020409; US 6477738 B1 20021112; WO 9951845 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EDSCHA ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ED. SCHARWAECHTER GMBH, 42855 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 59901192

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901192

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-07-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-07-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901192 20020516

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE