Global Patent Index - EP 1068428 A1

EP 1068428 A1 2001-01-17 - APPARATUS FOR COOLING A GAS TURBINE AIRFOIL AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR COOLING A GAS TURBINE AIRFOIL AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR KÜHLUNG VON GASTURBINENSCHAUFELN UND METHODE ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR PROFIL AERODYNAMIQUE DE TURBINE A GAZ ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1068428 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98904826 A

Priority

  • US 9801934 W
  • US 80329997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5752801A] An airfoil for use in a turbomachine such as a stationary vane in a gas turbine. The airfoil has a plurality of longitudinally extending ribs in its trailing edge region that form first cooling fluid passages extending from the airfoil cavity to the trailing edge of the airfoil. The first cooling fluid passages are tapered so that their height and width decrease as they extend toward the trailing edge. Turbulating fins are spaced along the length of each passage to increase the heat transfer. The ribs have a plurality of radially extending passages spaced along their length so as to form an array of interconnected longitudinal and radial passages. The airfoil is formed by a casting process using a core that has longitudinal and radial fingers that correspond to the longitudinal and radial passages of the airfoil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 15/02 (2006.01); F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F05D 2260/2212 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835137A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5752801 A 19980519; DE 69823236 D1 20040519; DE 69823236 T2 20050428; EP 1068428 A1 20010117; EP 1068428 B1 20040414; JP 3053174 B2 20000619; JP H10311203 A 19981124; WO 9835137 A1 19980813

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-05-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SIEMENS ENERGY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20120413

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS ENERGY, INC., ORLANDO, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69823236

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS ENERGY, INC., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69823236

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69823236

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BERG, PETER, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-10-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69823236

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PETER BERG, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2005-07-29 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS WESTINGHOUSE POWER CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69823236

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021028

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990802

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT